Flowr corp board of directors
WebAug 10, 2024 · Tom Flow, who has acted as Interim CEO of Flowr since March, remains on the Board along-side incumbents Joanne Lee and Ryan Roebuck. Darren Karasiuk, CEO … WebAug 10, 2024 · TORONTO, Aug. 10, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) — The Flowr Corporation (“Flowr” or the “Company”) today announced leadership and governance changes with the appointments of Darren Karasiuk to the role of Chief Executive Officer (“CEO”) and Director and the additions of Stephen Arbib as Chairman and Marvin …
Flowr corp board of directors
Did you know?
WebMar 18, 2024 · The Board of Directors will be providing additional support to management during the leadership transition to ensure effective leadership and decision-making as … WebNov 14, 2024 · The Company is pleased to welcome Ralph Desando and Lyle Oberg to the Board of Directors ... He is also the Chief Policy and Medical Officer of The Flowr Corporation, a position which he has held since May 2024. Mr. Oberg has also held a number of positions within the Alberta Government, including, Minister of Social Services …
WebOct 17, 2024 · TORONTO, Oct. 17, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- The Flowr Corporation (TSX.V: FLWR; OTC: FLWPF) (“Flowr” or the “Company”) announces that Stephen Arbib has resigned from the board of directors ... WebAug 10, 2024 · The Flowr Corporation. TORONTO, Aug. 10, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- The Flowr Corporation (TSX.V: FLWR; OTC: FLWPF) (“ Flowr ” or the “ Company ”) today announced leadership and governance ...
WebDec 16, 2024 · The Flowr Corporation announced that Jörg Cieslok has resigned from the Board of Directors in order to pursue other opportunities. February 19, 2024 WebBoard of Directors Tom Flow , Director Globally recognized for his cannabis thought leadership, Tom Flow is an expert at building and operating cannabis cultivation facilities.
WebAug 10, 2024 · TORONTO, Aug. 10, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) — The Flowr Corporation (“Flowr” or the “Company”) today announced leadership and governance changes with …
WebAug 6, 2024 · TORONTO, Aug. 06, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- The Flowr Corporation (TSX.V: FLWR; OTC: FLWPF) (“Flowr” or the “Company”) is pleased to announce that … tssc classifiedsWebAug 6, 2024 · --The Flowr Corporation is pleased to announce that Ryan Roebuck has joined the Board of Directors of the Company effective immediately. The Flowr … tssc dip locationtssc.comWebDec 24, 2024 · The Flowr Corporation announced announce new appointments to the Board of Directors which include Jörg Cieslok, Michael Galego, Vincent Gasparro and Joanne Lee. In addition, Stephen Arbib, Jonathan Goldman and Francisco Ortiz von Bismarck have been appointed as observers to the Board of Directors. phi symbol chemistryWebOct 20, 2024 · The Board of Directors of the Combined Company will be comprised of 5 Flowr existing directors (including two directors that are independent), 3 nominees from Terrace Global and a new independent director mutually agreed to by Flowr and Terrace Global. ... The Board of Directors of Flowr (the “Board”) has unanimously approved the ... phi symbol copy and pasteWebAug 6, 2024 · The Flowr Corporation announced that Ryan Roebuck has joined the Board of Directors of the Company effective immediately. Mr. Roebuck is the co-founder and CEO of Edition X, which owns and operates cannabis retail stores and branded products and accessories in Canada and California. phi symbol in autocadWebAug 6, 2024 · TORONTO, Aug. 06, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- The Flowr Corporation (TSX.V: FLWR; OTC: FLWPF) (“Flowr” or the “Company”) is pleased to announce that Ryan Roebuck has joined the Board of ... tss cdc