Bob jones university board members
WebApr 7, 2024 · In a move likely unprecedented in modern American higher education, academic leadership of Bob Jones University demanded the resignation of the school’s trustee chair April 3, leading to his sudden resignation three days later.. The independent, fundamentalist university has been in leadership turmoil for the past week after … WebNov 17, 2024 · GREENVILLE, S.C. (November 17, 2024) – The Bob Jones University Board of Trustees is pleased to announce the re-election of Steve Pettit to a three-year term as President by an overwhelming majority on Thursday, November 17, 2024. The Board strongly supports the President, and is committed and enthusiastic about working …
Bob jones university board members
Did you know?
WebMar 31, 2024 · Dr. Steve Pettit – the fifth president of Greenville, S.C.-based Bob Jones University – stepped down late Thursday following a closed-door meeting that also saw … WebMar 31, 2024 · March 31, 2024. 9:35 am CDT. 9 Comments. Steve Pettit has announced his resignation as president of Bob Jones University in Greenville, South Carolina. (Courtesy Photos) Bob Jones University President Steve Pettit has announced he’s resigning, following months of contention between him and BJU Board Chairman John Lewis over …
WebThursday, March 30, President Pettit announced to the University that this would be his final year as president of BJU. We’re thankful for his years of service and his love for … WebApr 6, 2024 · Bob Jones University (BJU) Board Chairman John Lewis resigned today—less than a week after BJU President Steve Pettit announced his resignation, effective May 5. A petition calling for Lewis’ resignation launched in response to Pettit’s announcement has more than 7,800 signatures.
[email protected]. Coaching Staff - Men's and Women's Cross Country / Track and Field. Ken Roach. Head Coach - Cross Country Track & Field. [email protected]. Jonathan … WebChairman, Bob Jones University Board of Trustees To Dr. Lewis and the BJU board, Bob Jones University has been a significant institution in American Christian …
WebApr 7, 2024 · “Late this afternoon, I was notified that Bob Jones University Board of Trustees Chairman Dr. John Lewis has resigned from the Board of Trustees effective …
WebGREENVILLE, S.C. (August 25, 2024) – Dr. John Lewis, chairman of the Bob Jones University Board of Trustees, announced today the renewal of Dr. Steve Pettit’s contract as president of BJU through June 1, 2024. Pettit’s contract was previously renewed in 2024. “Dr. Pettit has been an exemplary leader of BJU and has led through important ... nuchem montrealWebApr 10, 2024 · The chair of Bob Jones University's Board of Trustees has resigned effective immediately, days after the conservative Christian school's president resigned, reportedly over issues regarding campus leadership. BJU Board of Trustees Chairman John Lewis tendered his resignation last Thursday after having served over 30 years as a … nuc heat sinkWebAlan Benson, DMin Executive Vice President for Student Development and Ministry Advancement John Matthews, MBA Vice President for Advancement and Alumni Relations Bobby Wood, PhD Vice President for Enrollment and Marketing Steve … With the addition of 6 academic schools, Bob Jones College became Bob Jones … BS, Biology, Bob Jones University; Courses. Patient Safety Leadership ; … He also serves as a board member on the BJU Education Group. Gary and his wife … nuch fold